This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/28/2021 at 03:38:58 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. LUNAR

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LUNAR. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7672

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

David Lunar

Delano, CA 93216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Charles J. Sarosy

Attorney at Attorney General Office

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Joanna McKim

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 19493

San Diego, CA 92159

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: David Lunar Attorney: Joanna McKim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B297583; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA451461

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles J. Sarosy