This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/10/2022 at 06:46:33 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. KALAMKARIAN

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KALAMKARIAN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0257

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Haroutioun Kalamkarian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

John Yang

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Susan K. Shaler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review to exhaust state remedies filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Haroutioun Kalamkarian Attorney: Susan K. Shaler

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/06/2021

DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Haroutioun Kalamkarian Attorney: Susan K. Shaler

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B305996; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PA090643

[+] Read More [-] Read Less