This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/25/2021 at 05:06:29 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. JOVEN

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOVEN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7620

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Eloy Joven, Jr.

Imperial, CA 92251

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Cavan M Cox

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721-3534

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Cara DeVito

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9360 West Flamingo Road, No. 110-492

Las Vegas, NV 89147

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review to exhaust state remedies filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Eloy Joven, Jr. Attorney: Cara DeVito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Eloy Joven, Jr. Attorney: Cara DeVito

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F078263; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Tulare County Superior Court - Main (Visalia); Trial Court Case Number: VCF316448

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cavan M. Cox