This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/03/2022 at 21:13:36 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOSEPH. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3389

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Jordan Emon Joseph

Blythe, CA 92226

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Wyatt Evan Bloomfield

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Sally P. Brajevich

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9461 Charleville Boulevard, # 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Jordan Emon Joseph Attorney: Sally P. Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B309455; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: YA093603

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sally P. Brajevich