This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/06/2021 at 02:03:27 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. JONES

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8139

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Devin Deshon Jones

Soledad, CA 93960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Rama Ronald Maline

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Nancy Tetreault

Attorney at Attorney at Law

346 N. Larchmont Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90004-3012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Devin Deshon Jones Attorney: Nancy Tetreault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302475; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: TA032267

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Tetreault