This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/07/2022 at 21:18:05 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. HARDNEY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARDNEY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1192

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

John Hardney

Represa, CA 95671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Chung Mi Choi

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review, 1 doghouse (volume 1 of 5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (volume 1 of 5).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: John Hardney Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C089522; Disposition: Affirmed in part and reversed in part; Trial Court: Amador Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 14CR22899

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chung Mi Choi