This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/06/2023 at 13:10:46 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. GONZALES

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GONZALES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5331

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Robert Gonzales

Los Angeles, CA 90086

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

John Yang

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 5212

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Charles J. Sarosy

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Edward J. Haggerty

Attorney at Law Offices of Edward J. Haggerty

20955 Pathfinder Road, Suite 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including October 6, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: John Yang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: John Yang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B301485; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: PA042487

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less