This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/06/2023 at 18:01:02 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. GARRETT

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GARRETT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7517

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Marcus Lewis Garrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Allison H. Chung

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Janyce Keiko Imata Blair

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Marcus Lewis Garrett Attorney: Janyce Keiko Imata Blair

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Marcus Lewis Garrett Attorney: Janyce Keiko Imata Blair

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B298495; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: A955129

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less