This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/16/2021 at 02:59:39 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. GALARZA

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GALARZA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8654

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Juan Carlos Galarza

Soledad, CA 93960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Stacy S. Schwartz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Nancy Tetreault

Attorney at Attorney at Law

346 North Larchmont Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90004-3012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; briefing deferred; Notes: The petition for review is granted. Further action in this matter is deferred pending consideration and disposition of related issues in People v. Lopez, S258175 and People v. Lewis, S260598 (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(d)(2)), or pending further order of the court. Submission of additional briefing, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.520, is deferred pending further order of the court. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Cullar, Kruger, Groban and Jenkins, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Juan Carlos Galarza Attorney: Nancy Tetreault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303867; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA227460

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy S. Schwartz