This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2022 at 23:42:32 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. FISHER

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FISHER. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9689

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Dumar Cardin Fisher

Corcoran, CA 93212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

David Wildman

Attorney at Office Of The Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Stacy S. Schwartz

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S Spring Street., Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Laini M. Melnick

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1187 Coast Village Road Suite 1-573

Santa Barbara, CA 93108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Corrigan, J., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Corrected proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Dumar Cardin Fisher Attorney: Laini M. Melnick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303419; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA191112

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laini Millar Melnick