This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/05/2022 at 04:13:55 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ESQUIVEL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ESQUIVEL. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5916

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendants and Appellants

Percella Marissa Esquivel

San Jose, CA 95138

Robert Anthony Ruiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Juliet B. Haley

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Lori A. Quick

Attorney at Sixth District Appellate Program

95 S. Market Street, Suite 570

San Jose, CA 95113

Richard L. Fitzer

Attorney at Law Office of Richard Fitzer

6285 East Spring Street

Long Beach, CA 90808

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petitions for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petitions for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: 2nd petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Percella Marissa Esquivel Attorney: Lori A. Quick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Robert Anthony Ruiz Attorney: Richard L. Fitzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Robert Anthony Ruiz Attorney: Richard L. Fitzer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H048810; Disposition: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: C1808374

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lori A. Quick

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard L. Fitzer