This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/02/2022 at 23:08:09 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. EGGMAN

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EGGMAN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3873

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

David James Eggman

Calipatria, CA 92233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Edrina Mary Anderson

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

1300 I Street P.O Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Cavan M Cox

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

2550 Mariposa Mall, Room 5090

Fresno, CA 93721-2271

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Micah R. Reyner

Attorney at Law Offices of Beles & Beles

1 Kaiser Plaza, Suite 2300

Oakland, CA 94612

Robert J. Beles

Attorney at Law Offices of Beles & Beles

1 Kaiser Plaza, Suite 2300

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse (volume 1 of 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (volume 1 of 2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: David James Eggman Attorney: Robert J. Beles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C089400; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 18FE000227

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Micah R. Reyner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELES, ROBERT J.