This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/07/2022 at 00:01:27 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. EDDY

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EDDY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4654

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Morgan Eastwood Eddy

Vacaville, CA 95696

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey D. Firestone

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Candace Hale

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 775

San Anselmo, CA 94979-0775

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse (vol. 1 of 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (volume 1 of 3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Morgan Eastwood Eddy Attorney: Candace Hale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C092547; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Shasta County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 16F2585

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Candace Hale