This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/19/2023 at 17:01:52 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. DOWNS

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DOWNS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7322

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

David Downs

Tehachapi, CA 93581

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

John Yang

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Teresa Biagini

Attorney at Attorney at Law

1442 South Winchester Boulevard Suite 132

San Jose, CA 95128

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; briefing deferred; Notes: The petition for review is granted. Further action in this matter is deferred pending consideration and disposition of a related issue in People v. Gray, S269237 (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(d)(2)), or pending further order of the court. Submission of additional briefing, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.520, is deferred pending further order of the court. Votes: Guerrero, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger, Groban, Jenkins and Evans, JJ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received additional record; Notes: one file jacket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: David Downs Attorney: Teresa Biagini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: David Downs Attorney: Teresa Biagini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B315593; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: TA150279

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less