This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/30/2021 at 21:19:27 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. DHILLON

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DHILLON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0529

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Nirvair Singh Dhillon

Represa, CA 95671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberley Ann Donohue

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Mark Hart

Attorney at Law Office of Mark Hart

9420 Reseda Boulevard, Pmb 520

Northridge, CA 91324

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse (volume 1 of 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Nirvair Singh Dhillon Attorney: Mark Hart

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C090931; Disposition: Affirmed in part and remanded with directions; Trial Court: San Joaquin County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: STKCRFE20170014876

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Hart