This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/29/2022 at 23:37:37 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. DELGADO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DELGADO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1199

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Ivan Delgado

Calipatria, CA 92233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Colleen M. Tiedemann

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring St. Ste. 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Heather Lee Beugen

Attorney at Law Office of Heather Beugen

P.O. Box 882015

San Diego, CA 92168

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ivan Delgado Attorney: Heather Lee Beugen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302051; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: VA148234

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather Lee Beugen