This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/07/2022 at 21:21:12 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. DELEON

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DELEON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1200

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Santiago Jimmy Deleon, Jr.

San Diego, CA 92179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Ksenia D. Gracheva

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Pauline E. Villanueva

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 928493

San Diego, CA 92192

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Santiago Jimmy Deleon, Jr. Attorney: Pauline E. Villanueva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E075180; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: INF1800734

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pauline Erika Villanueva