This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/09/2022 at 21:13:19 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. DEANDA

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DEANDA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3461

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Robert Deanda

Crescent City, CA 95532

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Galen N. Farris

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

David W. Beaudreau

Attorney at Law Office of David W. Beaudreau

748 South Meadows Parkway Suite A9-182

Reno, NV 89521

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 Doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Robert Deanda Attorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C089940; Disposition: Affirmed in part and remanded with directions; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 16FE019416

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Beaudreau