This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/30/2022 at 21:03:46 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. DARRINGTON

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DARRINGTON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4524

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Kewetha Lavory Darrington, Jr.

Susanville, CA 96127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Quisteen Si Yin Shum

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Donna L. Harris

Attorney at Donna L. Harris, Attorney at Law

7268 Murieta Drive, No. 1193

Sloughhouse, CA 95683-9998

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kewetha Lavory Darrington, Jr. Attorney: Donna L. Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E074847; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: San Bernardino County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: FVI19002033

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donna L. Harris