This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/23/2021 at 23:39:53 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. COON

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0409

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

James Curtis Coon

Coalinga, CA 93210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Seth Matthew Friedman

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Ronda G. Norris

P.O. Box 53

Hattiesburg, MS 39403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 2 doghouses (volumes 1 & 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Two doghouses (volume 1 & 2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: James Curtis Coon Attorney: Ronda G. Norris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: James Curtis Coon Attorney: Ronda G. Norris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E072958; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: SWF1707439

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronda G. Norris