This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/01/2022 at 21:15:37 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. CLAYTON

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLAYTON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0309

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Darryl Clayton, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Wise

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Olivia Meme

Richard B. Lennon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021

DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Darryl Clayton, Jr. Attorney: Olivia Meme

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2021

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Michael J. Wise

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B308524; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: NA041958

[+] Read More [-] Read Less