This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2022 at 12:19:19 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. CLARK

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CLARK. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8691

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellants and Defendants

Gerquan Dwayne Clark

Calipatria, CA 92233

Anthony Maurice Brown

Represa, CA 95671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Peter H. Smith

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Victoria H. Stafford

Attorney at Attorney at Law

6114 Lasalle Avenue, #161

Oakland, CA 94611

James S. Thomson

Attorney at Attorney at Law

732 Addison Street, Suite A

Berkeley, CA 94710

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse (volume 1 of 2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse (1 of 2 volumes)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review to exhaust state remedies filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Anthony Maurice Brown Attorney: James S. Thomson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C089046; Disposition: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 18FE008129

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H. Smith