This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/05/2022 at 13:01:09 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. CHAMBERS

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CHAMBERS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4773

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

William Dan Chambers

Norco, CA 92860

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Darren K. Indermill

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

John L. Staley

Attorney at Attorney at Law

12463 Rancho Bernardo Drive, Suite 372

San Diego, CA 92128

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: William Dan Chambers Attorney: John L. Staley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: William Dan Chambers Attorney: John L. Staley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C094244; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: Butte County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 18CF01308; Trial Court: Butte County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 18CF01854; Trial Court: Butte County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 21CF00177

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L. Staley