This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/06/2021 at 03:53:29 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. BURGESS

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BURGESS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7662

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Reginald Burgess

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

A. Natasha Cortina

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800 P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Ava R. Stralla

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 28880

San Diego, CA 92198

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied; CA opinion decertified

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; CA opinion decertified; Notes: The petition for review is denied. On the court's own motion, the Reporter of Decisions is directed not to publish in the Official Appellate Reports the opinion in the above-entitled appeal filed February 11, 2021, which appears at 60 Cal.App.5th 885. (Cal. Const., art. VI, section 14; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1125(c)(2).) Liu, J., is of the opinion the petition should be granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Reginald Burgess Attorney: Ava R. Stralla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D076287; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: SCD279344

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer A. Natasha Cortina