This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/12/2021 at 21:10:52 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. BROWN

Case Summary

On 10/13/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BROWN. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1259

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellants and Defendants

Shawn Lamont Brown

Corcoran, CA 93212

LaChance Larue Thomas

Soledad, CA 93960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Sally Espinoza

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125 P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Cliff Gardner

Attorney at Law Office of Cliff Gardner

1448 San Pablo Avenue

Berkeley, CA 94702

Brooke Nicole Acevedo

Attorney at Law Offices of Cliff Gardner

1448 San Pablo Ave

Berkeley, CA 94702-1046

David Y. Stanley

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 107

Lincoln City, OR 97367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: 2nd petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Shawn Lamont Brown Attorney: Cliff Gardner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review to exhaust state remedies filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: LaChance Larue Thomas Attorney: David Y. Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: LaChance Larue Thomas Attorney: David Y. Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F077143; Disposition: Affirmed with modifications; Trial Court: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: F15904751

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Y. Stanley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clifford Gardner