This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/15/2022 at 13:17:42 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. BRIGETT

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRIGETT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0167

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Newman Brigett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Attorney General - San Diego Office

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Newman Brigett Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Newman Brigett Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D079188; Disposition: Other involuntary dismissal; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CR116632

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant