This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/08/2022 at 21:21:05 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ARMSTRONG

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ARMSTRONG. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2282

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Shamar Armstrong

Susanville, CA 96127

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Henry J. Valle

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

David Y. Stanley

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P. O. Box 107

Lincoln City, OR 97367

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 doghouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One doghouse.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review to exhaust state remedies filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Shamar Armstrong Attorney: David Y. Stanley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C091313; Disposition: Affirmed in part and reversed in part; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 17FE010746

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Y. Stanley