This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/20/2021 at 23:40:55 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0471

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Brook Michael Alvarez

Corcoran, CA 93212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie C. Santoro

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Nancy L. Tetreault

Attorney at Attorney at Law

346 North Larchmont Boulevard,

Los Angeles, CA 90004-3012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 3 clerk's transcripts, 1 reporter's transcript, 1 confidential/sealed envelope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Three clerk's transcripts, one reporter's transcript, one sealed/confidential envelope.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Brook Michael Alvarez Attorney: Nancy L. Tetreault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B305462; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: VA056865

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Tetreault