This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/20/2022 at 21:10:55 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ALNAJJAR

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALNAJJAR. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2756

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Mohammad Alnajjar

El Sobrante, CA 94803

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Jalem Zatmari Peguero

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

David W. Beaudreau

Attorney at Law Office of David W. Beaudreau

748 South Meadows Parkway Suite A9-182

Reno, NV 89521

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Defendant's application to file the unredacted petition for review under seal is granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.47.) The clerk of this court is directed to file the unredacted petition for review under seal. The petition for review is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: UNREDACTED Petition for Review **Conditionally Under Seal** -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Mohammad Alnajjar, Defendant and Appellant David W. Beaudreau, CA appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to file document under seal filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Mohammad Alnajjar, Defendant and Appellant David W. Beaudreau, CA appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Mohammad Alnajjar Attorney: David W. Beaudreau **REDACTED VERSION**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Mohammad Alnajjar Attorney: David W. Beaudreau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: A160121; Disposition: Affirmed in part and reversed in part; Trial Court: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 51915313

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Beaudreau