This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/26/2021 at 13:16:40 (UTC).

PEOPLE v. ALARCON

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALARCON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0518

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Ernest Alarcon

Tehachapi, CA 93581

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Charles J. Sarosy

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Sally P. Brajevich

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9461 Charleville Boulevard, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; briefing deferred; Notes: The petition for review is granted. Further action in this matter is deferred pending consideration and disposition of related issues in People v. Lopez, S258175 (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(d)(2)), or pending further order of the court. Submission of additional briefing, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.520, is deferred pending further order of the court. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Cullar, Kruger, Groban and Jenkins, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One jacket.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ernest Alarcon Attorney: Sally P. Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ernest Alarcon Attorney: Sally P. Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311345; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA203925

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sally P. Brajevich