This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/23/2022 at 02:37:46 (UTC).

People of the State of California v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schulman, Ethan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0706

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schulman, Ethan

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellants and Defendants

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Lyft, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Shinobu Ichino

Martina Hassett

Sean Puttick

Marissa Gutierrez

Danitza Munoz

David Torres

Amicus Curiae

The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

Denise Alvarado, Mimi Fan, et al.

Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area

La Raza Centro Legals Workers Rights Program

Centro Legal de la Raza

Worksafe, Inc.

Gig Workers Rising

UNITE HERE

California Labor Federation

California Employment Lawyers Association

Rideshare Drivers United

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Rosa Erandi Zamora

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor P.O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Yvonne Rosil Mere

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1390 Market Street - 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Molly J. Alarcon

Attorney at San Francisco City Attorney's Office

1390 Market Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102-5408

Matthew David Goldberg

Attorney at San Francisco City Attorney Office

1390 Market Street, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Marisa Beth Hernandez-Stern

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Michael J. Bostrom

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

200 North Spring St., 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Mark D. Ankcorn

Attorney at San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-4100

Kevin B. King

Attorney at San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-4100

Marni Lynn Von Wilpert

Attorney at San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-4100

Sara Jennifer Eisenberg

Attorney at San Francisco City Attorney's Office

Fox Plaza 1390 Market Street, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Heather Lynn Richardson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 S Grand Ave.

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Theane Evangelis

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 South Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Blaine H. Evanson

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

R. James Slaughter

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Rohit Kumar Singla

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson

560 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jeffrey Y. Wu

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Justin Paul Raphael

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Rachael E. Meny

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Elizabeth K. McCloskey

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

29 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petitions for review are denied. The requests for an order directing depublication of the opinion are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting of denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including March 1, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Request for depublication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: On application of respondent, the request to file a combined answer to the petitions for review hereby is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By Uber, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By Lyft, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mod. of opinion filed (no change in judgment).; Notes: & denying petitions for rehearing;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: "Exhibit B proposed order"

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: atty Steven S. Fleischman; dated 8.18.20; seeking permission to file a/c letter of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America;permission to file granted 8.20.20;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 6 OF 6 (PAGES 2069 TO 2463 OF 2463)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 5 OF 6 (PAGES 1751 TO 2068 OF 2463)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 4 OF 6 (PAGES 1217 TO 1750 OF 2463)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 3 OF 6 (PAGES 959 TO 1216 OF 2463)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 2 OF 6 (PAGES 664 TO 958 OF 2463)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: VOLUME 1 OF 6 (PAGES 1 TO 663 OF 2463)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: Emergency Stay Requested of Preliminary Injunction Entered August 10, 2020 (Current Stay Expires August 20, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20584402; Trial Court Judge: Schulman, Ethan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIDESHARE DRIVERS UNITED is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Centro Legal de la Raza is a litigant