This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/17/2022 at 00:29:33 (UTC).

People of the State of California et al. v. Dodg Corp.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Dodg Corp. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Seligman, Brad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4933

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Seligman, Brad

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

People of the State of California

City of Oakland

Defendants and Appellants

Dodg Corp.

SBMann2, LLC

Baljit Mann

Surinder Mann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Maria S. Bee

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1 Frank Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Zoe M. Savitsky

Attorney at Office of the Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza - City Hall, 6Th

Oakland, CA 94612

Katherin Read

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney's Office

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Barbara Parker

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

One Frank H. Ogawa Plaza - 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Zarah Rahman

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank Ogawa Plaza - City Hall, 6Th Fl.

Oakland, CA 94612

Scott William Hugo

Attorney at Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank Ogawa Plaza 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Jamilah A. Jefferson

Attorney at Office of the Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Ian Kelley

Attorney at Bryan Law Group

885 Bryant Street - 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Aaron C. Hancock

Attorney at Bishop Barry, APC

6001 Shellmound Street, Suite 875

Emeryville, CA 94608

Edward Laucks Xanders

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Edward M. Higginbotham

Attorney at Bryan Law Group

885 Bryant Street - 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Eleanor Saegert Ruth

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein, & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Barry W. Lee

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Amended Designation filed 11/18/2021. Designating CT with RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 11/29/2021. Designating additional RT dates.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Edward Xanders and Eleanor Ruth associated as counsel for appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Dodg Corp. Attorney: Edward Laucks Xanders (order attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Dodg Corp.Attorney: Edward Laucks Xanders; Notes: (order attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: pd; R157251;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 03/30/2022 by Counsel for Defendant Dodg Corp. et al. appealing judgments from 02/01/2022 and 03/10/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19022353; Trial Court Judge: Seligman, Brad

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sbmann2, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF OAKLAND is a litigant

Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant