This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/09/2023 at 03:04:36 (UTC).

People ex rel. Alison Tonti v. Living Rebos, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 People ex rel Alison Tonti filed an Other lawsuit against Living Rebos, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Linfield, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2999

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Linfield, Michael

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

People ex rel. Alison Tonti

Defendants

Living Rebos, LLC

Avee Laboratories, Inc.

Millenium Health, LLC

Respondents and Defendants

Avee Laboratories, Inc.

Millenium Health, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Sebastian M. Medvei

Attorney at Medvei Law Group

655 N. Central Avenue Floor 1700

Glendale, CA 91203

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

James R. P. Hileman

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 N. Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Sierra Elizabeth

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jonathan Frederick Buck

Attorney at Polsinelli, LLP

2049 Century Park E, Ste 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: James R.P. Hileman is granted pro hac vice admission representing respondent Avee Laboratories, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: Pro hac vice application for James R.P. Hileman for Respondent Avee Laboratories, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Sierra Elizabeth of Kirkland & Ellis LLP associates in as counsel of record for respondent Avee Laboratories, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Aug 29, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Notice: This Court has received appellant's civil case information statement. The case has been assigned the above referenced number. Any counsel who are not licensed to practice in the State of California and intend to appear in or file any documents with this Court must first file an application to appear pro hac vice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(c)(2). This application must be made to this Court regardless of any previous order granting pro hac vice appearance filed in the trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: People ex rel. Alison Tonti Attorney: Sebastian M. Medvei (U2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (U2)Appellant's $775 filing fee paid by Sebastian Medvei.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: People ex rel. Alison TontiAttorney: Sebastian M. Medvei; Notes: (U2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.(U2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on August 18, 2022 by People ex rel. Alison Tonti. (U2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC674091; Trial Court Judge: Linfield, Michael

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIVING REBOS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MILLENNIUM HEALTH LLC is a litigant