This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/23/2022 at 22:50:43 (UTC).

PENG v. F.M. TARBELL

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PENG filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against F M TARBELL. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9724

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Bo Peng

Chino Hills, CA 91709

Respondent and Defendant

F.M. Tarbell Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Keith Griffin

Attorney at Griffin P.C.

19200 Von Karman Avenue Ste 900

Irvine, CA 92612-8525

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bo Peng Pro Per Received via USPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B307484; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCP00416

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where F. M. Tarbell Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFIN BENJAMIN