This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/10/2022 at 12:50:22 (UTC).

PDTW, LLC v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 PDTW, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Claster, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9639

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Claster, William

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PDTW, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

The Superior Court of Orange County

Hon. William D. Claster Dept. Cx104 700 Civic Center Drive

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Interested Parties

Kyu Hong Kim, CPA, Inc.

Allyson Thompson

David Schnider

Laura Booth

Greenberg Glusker

John Hanna

Jene Park

Kenneth Chung

Law Office of David Schnider

Kyu Hong Kim

Nolan Heimman, LLC

Andrew Apfelberg

Kring & Chung, LLP

Norman Ko

KF Professional Group

Laura Hess

Joseph Foster

Allison Kwon

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dimitrios Biller

Attorney at LDT Consulting, Inc.

15113 West Sunset Blvd. Suite 109

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Interested Party Attorneys

Michael Barry Wilk

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois et al LLP

633 West 5Th St, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Glen R. Olson

Attorney at Long & Levit LLP, Merchants Exchange Blgd.

465 California St 5Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

Robert Scott Silver

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

11755 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Kevin H. Brogan

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill, LLP

300 S Grand Ave 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Richard Byron Peddie

Attorney at Richard Byron Peddie PC

5051 Euclid Ave

Boulder, CO 80303

John Andrew Wright

Attorney at Chapman, Glucksman, Dean & Roeb

11900 W Olympic Blvd Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: Efiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for a writ of mandamus is DENIED. Petitioner's request for judicial notice of its opening brief on appeal is DENIED. O'LEARY, P. J. * Before O'Leary, P. J., Ikola, J., and Thompson, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: Petitioner's request for judicial notice of aob in related G059293

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of related cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Amended petition and appendices were rejected. The pagination for volume 1 was incorrect. It went from page 5 to page 8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 6-vol's of exhibits in support of petition. - 1,424 pgs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: By pet PDTW, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KYU HONG KIM, CPA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PDTW, LLC is a litigant