This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/07/2021 at 00:04:45 (UTC).

PDTW, LLC et al. v. Kring & Chung, LLP et al.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 PDTW, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Kring Chung, LLP. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Claster, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9293

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Claster, William

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Thomas Wylde Holdings, LLC

Paula Thomas

PDTW, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

Allyson Thompson

Norman Ko

KF Professional Group

Nolan Heimman, LLP

Laura Hess

Joseph Foster

Laura Booth

Kring & Chung, LLP

Kenneth Chung

David Schnider

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Dimitrios Biller

Attorney at LDT Consulting, Inc.

15113 West Sunset Blvd. Suite #9

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jessica Rudin MacGregor

465 California St 5Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

Glen R. Olson

465 California St 5Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

Steven Jeremiah Pearse

Attorney at Chapman, Gluksman, Dean, & Roeb

11900 W Olympic Blvd Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1146

John Andrew Wright

Attorney at Chapman, Glucksman, Dean & Roeb

11900 W Olympic Blvd Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Robert Scott Silver

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

11755 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jennifer Elizabeth Newcomb

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

11755 Wilshire Blvd Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1519

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Respondent's amended proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Kring & Chung, LLP Attorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Kenneth Chung Attorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Allyson Thompson Attorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Laura Booth Attorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Laura Hess Attorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor One extension granted for a total of 44 days: 12/10/2020 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/05/2021 By 44 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 02/23/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: PDTW, LLCAttorney: Dimitrios Biller Plaintiff and Appellant: Thomas Wylde Holdings, LLCAttorney: Dimitrios Biller

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Kring & Chung, LLPAttorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Kenneth ChungAttorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Allyson ThompsonAttorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Laura BoothAttorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor Defendant and Respondent: Laura HessAttorney: Jessica Rudin MacGregor; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 44 days: 12/10/2020 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/05/2021 By 44 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Exhibits in support of motion for judicial notice were rejected. It needs to be bookmarked, the cover pages need to be listed in volume numbers, pagination, it also needs an index.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: $390 Responsive fees paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: filed by resp in support of EOT request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: No objections to the court's November 25, 2020 order have been received from any party. Appellants having confirmed the appeal is only as to the October 9, 2020 judgment of dismissal of defendants and respondents Kring & Chung, LLP, Kenneth Chung, Allyson Thompson, Laura Hess and Laura Booth (collectively the "K&C respondents"), all other defendants and respondents are ORDERED removed as parties to the appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellants' notice of appeal and civil case information statement state the appeal is from the trial court's July 28, 2020 "decision" sustaining demurrers without leave to amend. The trial court's ruling sustaining a demurrer is not an appealable order. (Villery v. Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation (2016) 246 Cal.App.4th 407, 412.) An appeal may be taken only from the subsequent judgment or order of dismissal signed by the trial court. (Code Civ. Proc., 581d; Flores v. Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation (2014) 224 Cal.App.4th 199, 203-204; Powell v. County of Orange (2011) 197 Cal.App.4th 1573, 1578.) Appellants are ORDERED to file a signed judgment or order of dismissal within 15 days of the date of this order or the appeal will be dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: A. Bosco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on 8-26-20. Requesting a copy of RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on 8-24-20. Proceeding by 8.124 w/ RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS returned again. Number for NOA date needs to be filled out. Section E "Service Requirement" needs to be filled out.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS is being returned. Missing COA case number on 1st page and subsequent pages. Page 4 part C "My electronic Service Address is" needs to be filled out. Allyson Thompson, Laura Booth and Laura Hess are not listed on CCIS "Party & Attorney info" Andrew Wright is missing email address in Party/Attorney info. No email address listed for Kevin Brogan in Party/Attorney info.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellants' PDTW LLC et al,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01115265; Trial Court Judge: Claster, William

    Read MoreRead Less