This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/16/2023 at 09:11:22 (UTC).

P&B Intermodal Services, LLC v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 P B Intermodal Services, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Byrdsong, Rupert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4549

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Byrdsong, Rupert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

P&B Intermodal Services, LLC

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong

Interested Party

Evan Folan

Others

Gli Logistics, Inc.

Jose Garcia

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Ace American Insurance Company

A&B, Inc.

Fidel Rodriguez

Its Technologies & Logistics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Nicholas William Davila

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

515 S. Flower St., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James E. Gibbons

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

515 S. Flower St., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jerome P. Doctors

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

515 S. Flower St., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 28

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Scott J. Corwin

Attorney at SCOTT J. CORWIN, APLC

860 Via De La Paz Suite E-Loft B

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272-7120

Minh Tri Nguyen

Attorney at Nguyen Lawyers, ALC

3777 Long Beach Blvd. #300

Long Beach, CA 90807

Lakshmi A. Odedra

Attorney at Nguyen Theam, LLP

3777 Long Beach Blvd #300

Long Beach, CA 90807-3339

Other Attorneys

James Michael McDermed

Attorney at RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C

9891 Irvine Center Dr., Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Carol Knowblow

Attorney at RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C.

9891 Irvine Center Dr., Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Michael Craig Douglass

Attorney at LYDECKER, LLP

445 S. Figueroa Street, Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julio Cirilo Salazar

Attorney at Laughlin, Falbo, Levy & Moresi, LLP

1 Capitol Mall Ste 400

Sacramento, CA 95814-3297

Paul N. Jacobs

Attorney at Jacobs & Dodds

2151 Michelson Drive Suite 168

Irvine, CA 92612

Robert John Bastone

Attorney at Jacobs & Dodds

2151 Michelson Dr Ste 168

Irvine, CA 92612

Richard Pellegrino

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD B. PELLEGRINO

15760 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 700

Encino, CA 91436

Kenneth Scott Perri

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

101 West Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on November 17, 2022. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on November 17, 2022. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Declaration of James E. Gibbons in support of petition for writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: service on Real Party in Interest, trial court and other parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Five (5) volumes of Exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and other appropriate relief; Memorandum of points and authorities.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P & B INTERMODAL SERVICES L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where ITS TECHNOLOGIES & LOGISTICS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant