This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/14/2023 at 22:00:40 (UTC).

P&B Intermodal Services, LLC v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 P B Intermodal Services, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Byrdsong, Rupert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3909

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Byrdsong, Rupert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

P&B Intermodal Services, LLC

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Evan Folan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

James E. Gibbons

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

515 S. Flower St., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jerome P. Doctors

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

515 S. Flower St., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nicholas William Davila

Attorney at London Fischer LLP

515 S. Flower St., Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Lakshmi A. Odedra

Attorney at Nguyen Theam, LLP

3777 Long Beach Blvd Fl 3

Long Beach, CA 90807-3339

Minh Tri Nguyen

Attorney at Nguyen Theam, LLP

3777 Long Beach Blvd. 3Rd Floor

Long Beach, CA 90807

Scott J. Corwin

Attorney at SCOTT J. CORWIN, APLC

860 Via De La Paz Suite E-Loft B

Pacific Palisades, CA 90272-7120

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition denied or dismissed after alternative writ or palma issued.; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: On October 19, 2022 this court directed the superior court to vacate its order of September 21, 2022 denying the motion for summary judgment and to issue a new order complying with Code of Civil Procedure section 473c, subdivisions (g) and (q). Prior to receiving our order, and in response to receiving a copy of the petition, the superior court issued an amended minute order, a copy of which was sent to this court. The superior court, through court counsel, subsequently informed this court of its belief that the petition is now moot. The amended minute order identifies triable issues of material fact. However, it appears in concluding that triable issues exist the superior court relied on evidence to which petitioner objected. Our order directed the superior court to rule on any objections made "to evidence that it deems material to its disposition of the motion." (Code Civ. Proc., 473c, subd. (q).) The superior court may have implicitly overruled the objections asserted by petitioner, but it did not expressly rule on them or state that any objected-to evidence was immaterial to the disposition of the motion. Should petitioner need further clarification from the superior court regarding objections, it should make that request to the superior court in the first instance. The petition is dismissed as moot.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Frederick Bennett old email 1: fbennett@lacourt.org new email 1: courtcounselwrits@lacourt.org old email 2: PNguyen1@lacourt.org; LGershon@LACourt.org new email 2: {blank}

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Los Angeles Superior Court Order, dated October 19, 2022 [..."Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment is denied."]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Palma sent. Response due:; Notes: [...In view of the clear legal error apparent in the respondent's order, and this court's determination the matter should be expedited, the parties are notified of our intention to issue a peremptory writ of mandate in the first instance compelling the respondent to comply with section 473c, subdivisions (g) and (q). (See Palma v. U.S. Industrial Fasteners, Inc. (1984) 36 Cal.3d 171, 177-183; Alexander v. Superior Court (1993) 5 Cal.4th 1218, 1222-1223.) The respondent may avoid issuance of a peremptory writ by vacating its order of September 21, 2022 denying the motion for summary judgment and issuing a new order that complies with section 473c, subdivisions (g) and (q). Before doing so, the court "must inform the parties that it is considering taking such action and provide them with an opportunity to be heard," as required by the Supreme Court in Brown, Winfield & Canzoneri, Inc. v. Superior Court (2010) 47 Cal.4th 1233, 1250. If the respondent proceeds as we have suggested, it shall, prior to November 8, 2022 transmit a copy of its new order to this court. In the event respondent does not proceed as we have suggested, the real party in interest shall serve and file an opposition to the petition, on or before November 30, 2022, with a view to expeditious disposition of this matter. (See Ng v. Superior Court (1992) 4 Cal.4th 29, 35.)]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Amended Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of Service to Los Angele Superior Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Notice of non-compliance emailed to petitioner's counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Five volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P & B INTERMODAL SERVICES L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORWIN SCOTT J. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ODEDRA LAKSHMI