This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/22/2022 at 11:58:08 (UTC).

Payette-Gutsue v. Gutsue

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Payette-Gutsue filed an Other lawsuit against Gutsue. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is May, Gus. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5065

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

May, Gus

 

Party Details

Appellant

Tammy Payette-Gutsue

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Respondent

Ron Miller

Not Yet Classified

Nicholas Chris Gutsue - Conservatorship

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Timothy L. McCandless

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TIMOTHY L. MCCANDLESS

26875 Calle Hermosa Suite A

Capistrano Beach, CA 92624

Respondent Attorneys

Audre Delahoussaye Quantrell

13101 W Washington Blvd Ste 235

Los Angeles, CA 90066-8128

Heidi L. Mattson

1790 W Chalet Ave

Anaheim, CA 92804-5537

Eric Robert Adler

Attorney at Magee & Adler, P.C.

400 Oceangate #1030

Long Beach, CA 90802

Cynthia Renee Pollock

Attorney at Cox Law Group, Inc.

23326 Hawthorne Blvd, Ste 390

Torrance, CA 90505

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed March 1, 2021, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (3/1/2021 by Tammy Payette-Gutsue ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: The October 4, 2021 filing of the civil case information statement has been cancelled, as it was not submitted by appellant's counsel of record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Tammy Payette-Gutsue Attorney: Timothy L. McCandless FILING CANCELLED ON OCTOBER 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Tammy Payette-GutsueAttorney: Timothy L. McCandless; Notes: FILING CANCELLED ON OCTOBER 6, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case information statement returned for correction.; Notes: NO Signed order or Judgment being appealed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated March 22, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 3/1/2021 by Tammy Payette-Gutsue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 18STPB08430; Trial Court Judge: May, Gus

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLLOCK CYNTHIA RENEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADLER ERIC ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTSON HEIDI L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUANTRELL AUDRE DELAHOUSSAYE