This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/08/2022 at 07:36:38 (UTC).

Paul Hupp v. The Superior Court; The People

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 Paul Hupp filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court The People. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8034

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Paul Hupp

Banning, CA 92220

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Office Of The District Attorney

3960 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Office Of The State Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: Request for stay is denied. McKinster Raphael Menetrez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.; Notes: by petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: Petitioner requesting for writ to enjoin Riverside County from further prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Prohibition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant