This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/16/2021 at 10:46:37 (UTC).

Patterson v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Patterson filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mackey, Malcolm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2411

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mackey, Malcolm

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Patterson

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Charter Communications, Inc., a corporation

DOES 1-50, Inclusive

Nicholas Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Petitioner Attorneys

Casey Lee Morris

Attorney at Hill Farrer & Burrill, LLP

300 S Grand Ave 37Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James Allen Bowles

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burrill Llp

300 S. Grand Ave. 37Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Kyle Todd

Attorney at Law Offices of Kyle Todd

1055 W. 7Th St. Ste 1920

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2732

Samantha Elizabeth Johnson

Attorney at Kyle Todd, P.C.

611 Wilshire Blvd Ste 315

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2931

Erika Alyse Silverman

Attorney at Hill, Farrer & Burrill

300 S Grand Ave Fl 37

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3147

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Malcolm Mackey

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Casey Morris for real parties in interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Kyle Todd for petitioner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: October 8, 2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice sent to parties re: case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply to return to petition for writ of mandate, prohibition, certiorari or other appropriate relief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Written return filed.; Notes: Real Parties in Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES: Good cause appearing, you are hereby ordered to show cause before this court, in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California when this matter is ordered on calendar, why you should not be compelled to vacate your order of March 16, 2021 and issue a new and different order denying the motion for attorney fees. The written return shall be served and filed by the real party in interest on or before July 7, 2021. Petitioner may file a reply to the written return, within 20 days after the filing of the return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply to real parties in interest's informal response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Charter Communications, Inc., a corporation Attorney: Casey Lee Morris Attorney: Erika Alyse Silverman Attorney: James Allen Bowles Real Party in Interest: Nicholas Lopez Real Party in Interest: DOES 1-50, Inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Charter Communications, Inc., a corporationAttorney: Casey Lee Morris Attorney: Erika Alyse Silverman Attorney: James Allen Bowles Real Party in Interest: Nicholas Lopez Real Party in Interest: DOES 1-50, Inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on May 14, 2021. The real parties in interest are requested to serve and file an informal response on or before June 2, 2021. Petitioner may file a reply on or before June 11, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: ***SUPPLEMENTAL*** Proof of Service showing service on Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Writ Petition with Bookmarks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, Certiorari or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON, SAMANTHA E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Todd