This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/05/2023 at 05:00:31 (UTC).

Patterson v. California Highway Patrol

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 Patterson filed an Other lawsuit against California Highway Patrol. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mennemeier, Jr., Kenneth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6289

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mennemeier, Jr., Kenneth

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Valerie G. Patterson

Appellant and Defendant

California Highway Patrol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher W. Wood

Attorney at Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora, LLP

20 Bicentennial Circle

Sacramento, CA 95826

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Julio A. Hernandez

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondent to recover costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Final This court notified appellant of its failure to timely file a Civil Case Information Statement as required by rule 8.100(g) of the California Rules of Court and the Appellant's Mediation Statement pursuant to Local Rule 1(d)(4). There has been no response to the court's notice. Therefore, the appeal filed on May 10, 2022, is dismissed. Robie, Acting P.J., Renner, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: This court notified appellant of its failure to timely file a Civil Case Information Statement as required by rule 8.100(g) of the California Rules of Court and the Appellant's Mediation Statement pursuant to Local Rule 1(d)(4). There has been no response to the court's notice. Therefore, the appeal filed on May 10, 2022, is dismissed. Robie, Acting P.J., Renner, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: and no Appellant's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement filed. CCIS and AMS due: 07/05/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellants file.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellants' Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: 6/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 5/10/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34201700221333CUPAGDS; Trial Court Judge: Mennemeier, Jr., Kenneth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less