This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/27/2021 at 02:20:16 (UTC).

Patrick Gonzales v. The Superior Court; Mygrant Glass Company et al.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 Patrick Gonzales filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court Mygrant Glass Company. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Greene, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7804

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Greene, Carol

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Patrick Gonzales

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Parties

Mygrant Glass Company

Troy Shaffer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Lisa Sidney Noveck

Attorney at Employees First Labor Law P.C.

65 N. Raymond Avenue, Suite 260

Pasadena, CA 91103

Amanda L Wilbur

Attorney at Employees First Labor Law P.C.

65 N. Raymond Avenue, Suite 260

Pasadena, CA 91103

Jonathan Pierre LaCour

Attorney at Employees First Labor Law P.C.

65 N. Raymond Avenue, Suite 260

Pasadena, CA 91103

Interested Party Attorneys

Joan Celeste Woodard

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

3 Park Center Drive, Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Roger Mohan Mansukhani

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

3 Park Center Drive, Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: petition, by respondent/real party in interest, per order of Nov 22, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondent and real party in interest are invited to file a response to the petition for writ of mandate/prohibition on file herein on or before Dec 13, 2021. Proceedings are stayed pending determination of the petition on its merits or further order of this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for stay filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: in support of petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Employees First Labor Law P.C., an immediate stay is not needed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: 1 vol exhibits in support of petition; each electronic bookmark must briefly describe the item to which it is linked, Rule 8.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: mandate with request for immediate stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: from petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MYGRANT GLASS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODARD, JOAN C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANSUKHANI ROGER MOHAN