This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/01/2021 at 02:31:54 (UTC).

Patricia Pelton v. Empire Polo Club et al.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Patricia Pelton filed an Other lawsuit against Empire Polo Club. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Firetag, Chad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5597

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Firetag, Chad

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Patricia Pelton

Defendants and Respondents

Haggen Company, LLC

Empire Polo Club

CI Security Specialists, Inc.

Staff Pro, Inc.

A Road Runner Garage Doors & Gates

CI Security Specialist, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Arash Khorsandi

Attorney at Law Office of Arash Khorsandi, PC

2960 Wilshire Blvd., Third Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Brian Gordon Beecher

Attorney at Law Office of Arash Khorsandi, PC

2960 Wilshire Blvd., Third Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Paul E. Heidenreich

Attorney at Huskinson, Brown & Heidenreich

1200 Aviation Blvd., Suite 202

Redondo Beach, CA 90278

Judd R. Allen

Attorney at The Law Offices of Arash Khorsandi, PC

2960 Wilshire Blvd., Third Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Thomas P. Gmelich

Attorney at Bradley & Gmelich

700 N. Brand Blvd., 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

Marshall Ryan Cole

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd., Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436

Kevin Joseph Gramling

Attorney at Klinedinst, PC

2 Park Plaza, Suite 1215

Irvine, CA 92614

Ian Anthony Rambarran

Attorney at Klinedinst, PC

2 Park Plaza, Suite 1215

Irvine, CA 92614

Mark McDonald Rudy

Attorney at Veatch Carlson

1055 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Case in basement storage.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Applnt's request for dismissal. Remittitur is ordered to issue immediately.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On or before 15 days from the date of this order applnt is to file a letter memorandum informing the court which parties are included in the judgment and a conformed copy of that judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Appeal is reinstated and applnt is to deposit $100 w/superior court clerk on or before 10 days from this order if they have not already done so.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Resp Staff Pro's response to motion to vacate dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Dtd Sep 16, 2020; Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.122(c) clerk's fees not deposited. Dated:; Notes: Aug 26, 2020; Also includes default for designations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Dtd Sep 10, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; missing a copy of the order and/or judgment being appealed from.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Aug 24, 2020; Patricia Pelton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1705618; Trial Court Judge: Firetag, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAGGEN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Staff Pro LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPIRE POLO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where CI SECURITY SPECIALISTS INC. is a litigant