This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/02/2022 at 00:11:02 (UTC).

Parver v. Subaru of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Parver filed an Other lawsuit against Subaru of America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitney, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0158

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Whitney, Richard

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Clifford Parver

Defendant and Respondent

Subaru of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Christine J. Haw

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices APC

1840 Century Park E, Ste 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Hallen D. Rosner

Attorney at Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

10085 Carroll Canyon Road Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92131

Jennifer Dale Bennett

Attorney at Gupta Wessler PLLC

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael Harris Rosenstein

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael H. Rosenstein, LC

1800 Century Park East, Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Payam Shahian

Attorney at Strategic Legal Practices, APC

1840 Century Park E., Ste 430

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Kristan Louise Ruggerello

Attorney at Ruggerello Law Group LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd Ste 650

Irvine, CA 92612

Ryan Peter Ruggerello

Attorney at Ruggerello Law Group LLP

19800 Macarthur Blvd Ste 650

Irvine, CA 92612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Certificate of interested entities and parties filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: Clerk's rule 8.124 and Reporter'sRT-6/627pgs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSRs, Kowalski: 6/2/21, Rhoads: 6/4/21, Lother: 6/8/21, Ross: 7/26/21, Jones: 9/1,2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Respondent's designation. Additional proceedings.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Parver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 3/18/22 - designate the record on appeal with specificity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on 3/17/22 by Clifford ParverNotice of appeal and election to proceed under rule 8.124

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2016-00007454-CU-BC-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Whitney, Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO KRISTAN LOUISE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO RYAN