This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/23/2023 at 01:35:38 (UTC).

Vanessa Marquina v. Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Vanessa Marquina filed an Other lawsuit against Nissan North America, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schneider, Jr., Wilfred. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0100

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schneider, Jr., Wilfred

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Vanessa Marquina

Appellant and Defendant

Nissan North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Neal Barry

Attorney at The Barry Law Firm

11845 Olympic Blvd., Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Andrew Patrick Matera

Attorney at The Barry Law Firm

11845 W Olympic Blvd., Suite 1270

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Carmen G. Espinosa

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP

402 West Broadway, Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Nalani L. Crisologo

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert Allen Shields

Attorney at Wilson Turner Kosmo, LLP

402 West Broadway, Suite 1600

San Diego, CA 92101

Amir M. Nassihi

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Andrew Lu-Young Chang

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Settlement Conference Rescheduled to:; Notes: @ 10:00 a.m. (rescheduled from 02/15/23). Parties noticed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Settlement conference statement filed.; Notes: Due date extended from 01/20/23 because 02/15/23 REMOTE S/C rescheduled to 03/06/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: ***ALL PROCEEDINGS STAYED, EXCEPT FILING OF RECORD, PENDING REMOTE S/C AND FURTHER COURT ORDER.***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: RE: Rescheduling of 02/15/23 REMOTE S/C to 03/06/23. Due date of Settlement Conference Statements rescheduled to 02/14/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Appellant's counsel advising he has the following dates on his calendar: March 6, 9, 10, and 22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Respondent's counsel advising March 6, 2023, is available on both his and his client's calendars RE: rescheduling of 02/15/23 REMOTE S/C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: All counsel of record advising court proposes to reschedule 02/15/23 REMOTE S/C to 03/06/23 @ 10:00 a.m. Requested counsel if this date does not work for counsel's and client's calendars to please consider the following dates: March 9, 10, 13, 15, and 22 and advise court if one or more of these dates are available on their calendars.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Appellant's Request to Continue Settlement Conference; Declaration of Andrew Chang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: ALL E-MAIL ADDRESSES RECEIVED RE: 02/15/23 REMOTE S/C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Respondent's counsel providing names and e-mail addresses of all individuals from their side who will be attending 02/15/23 remote S/C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Appellant's counsel RE: SCIF due 12/27/22. Sent another copy of notice and accompanying SCIF for completion and return by end of business today.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Respondent's SCIF rejected for failure to answer question 6 on form.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS; missing a copy of the order and/or judgment being appealed from.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Nov 9, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Nov 1 2022; Nissan North American, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVSB2117875; Trial Court Judge: Schneider, Jr., Wilfred

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPINOSA CARMEN G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NASSIHI AMIR M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRISOLOGO, NALANI L.