This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/24/2022 at 03:24:31 (UTC).

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency v. M.S.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 S D County Health Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against M S. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bejarano, Marissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0900

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bejarano, Marissa

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

M. S.

Not Yet Classified

A. S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

5530 Overland Avenue, Suite 170

San Diego, CA 92123

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

William D. Caldwell

111 W. Ocean Blvd., Suite 400

Long Beach, CA 90802

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Upon written request filed by appellant Father M.S., the appeal is DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.411(a)(b).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Upon written request filed by appellant Father M.S., the appeal is DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.411(a)(b).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: William D. Caldwell for appellant father; AOB extended to 10/31/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-1 (201 pages); RT-5 (114 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 9/7/22 by father (SJ13326B)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SJ13326; Trial Court Judge: Bejarano, Marissa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SJ13326B; Trial Court Judge: Bejarano, Marissa

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALDWELL WILLIAM DRAYTON