This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2023 at 16:09:07 (UTC).

City of Fresno v. Fresno Building Healthy Communities (CON/F084666)

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 City of Fresno filed an Other lawsuit against Fresno Building Healthy Communities CON/F084666. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4662

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Respondents, Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

City of Fresno

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant

Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Respondent and Intervenor

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Travis Ray Stokes

Anthony Robert Taylor

Timothy A. Bittle

Not Yet Classified, Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Deborah Barthel Caplan

Respondent and Intervenor Attorney

Timothy A. Bittle

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Attny Caplan obo Pltf/Applt; Reply Brief in support of their Motion for Judicial Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 07/03/2023 By 32 Day(s) 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Request for Judicial Notice filed 5/2/23 and opposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Atty Taylor obo Resp; to request for judicial notice filed 5/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Atty Stokes obo respondent associates atty Taylor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: atty Caplan obo applt - requesting judicial notice of excerpt of the Adopted Budget of the City of Fresno California for Fiscal Year 2023 - holding 15 days for possible opposition.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Fresno Building Healthy Communities Attorney: Deborah Barthel Caplan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: 3V/642 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/03/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff, Cross-defendant and Respondent: City of FresnoAttorney: Travis Ray Stokes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Appellant: Fresno Building Healthy CommunitiesAttorney: Deborah Barthel Caplan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: atty Caplan obo Applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: for respondent of City of Fresno

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Caplan obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Stokes obo Resp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: atty Caplan obo Fresno Building Healthy Communities, check # 14304 in the amount of $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Dear Deborah Caplan: California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(b)(1) provides that the notice of appeal must be accompanied by a $775 filing fee or an application for waiver of court fees and costs. Since the copy of your notice of appeal filed was not accompanied by either, your appeal may be dismissed within 15 days of this notice unless you either transmit the filing fee or show good cause why the court should excuse payment of those fees. Although you may have previously submitted an application for waiver of court fees and costs in the superior court, you must also submit a separate application addressed to this court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Caplan obo applt filed an appeal on 7/21/22; Appealing 5/24/22 order denying motion for attorney fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 19CECG00432; Trial Court Judge: Gaab, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 19CECG00422; Trial Court Judge: Gaab, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less