This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/14/2023 at 14:05:18 (UTC).

City of Fresno v. Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 City of Fresno filed an Other lawsuit against Fresno Building Healthy Communities. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4662

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

City of Fresno

Defendant and Appellant

Fresno Building Healthy Communities

Intervenor

Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Travis Ray Stokes

Attorney at Fresno City Attorney's Office

2600 Fresno St, Room 2031

Fresno, CA 93721

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Deborah Barthel Caplan

Attorney at Olson Remcho, LLP

555 Capitol Mall #400

Sacramento, CA 95814-4602

Intervenor Attorney

Timothy A. Bittle

Attorney at Howard Jarvis Taxpayer Assn.

921 Eleventh Street, Suite 1201

Sacramento, CA 95814

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: To Counsel re: AOB & Appendix due within 40 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RTX only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: & Receipt for Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: 1V/21 Pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: 11/28/22; Ctrr Colby

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: 11/28/22; Superior Court Clerk's Certificate of Mailing a copy of the Register of Actions to parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 11/4/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the case has not been selected for this court's mediation program (Local Rules, rule 2(c)). Suspension of record preparation pursuant to local rule 2 is lifted and California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124 and 8.216, are reinstated as of the date of this letter; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: letter from Atty Caplan obo Applt in re: mediation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: atty Caplan obo Applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: for respondent of City of Fresno

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Caplan obo applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Stokes obo Resp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: atty Caplan obo Fresno Building Healthy Communities, check # 14304 in the amount of $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Dear Deborah Caplan: California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(b)(1) provides that the notice of appeal must be accompanied by a $775 filing fee or an application for waiver of court fees and costs. Since the copy of your notice of appeal filed was not accompanied by either, your appeal may be dismissed within 15 days of this notice unless you either transmit the filing fee or show good cause why the court should excuse payment of those fees. Although you may have previously submitted an application for waiver of court fees and costs in the superior court, you must also submit a separate application addressed to this court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Caplan obo applt filed an appeal on 7/21/22; Appealing 5/24/22 order denying motion for attorney fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 19CECG00422; Trial Court Judge: Gaab, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Fresno is a litigant

Latest cases where Howard Jarvis Taxpayers Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy A. Bittle