This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/20/2022 at 02:08:48 (UTC).

In re B.H.; CFS v. N.S.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 In re B H CFS filed an Other lawsuit against N S. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9394

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alexander, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Defendant and Appellant

N. S.

Not Yet Classified

B. H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

385 N. Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Vincent Walter Davis

Attorney at Law Office of Vincent W. Davis & Associates

440 E. Huntington Drive, Suite 100

Arcadia, CA 91006

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (155 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-4 (1048 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: 2nd amended dtd Aug 12, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice re: retained counsel filed.; Notes: Atty Vincent Davis for Applnt N.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: amended dtd Jul 25, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Case may proceed as an appeal from an order after judgment. (Welf. & Inst. Code, 395((a)(1); In re Meranda P. (1997) 56 Ca1.App.4th 1143, 1149-1150.) Superior court clerk is to prepare the record on appeal and provide a copy to appellant's attorney pursuant to Welfare and Institutions Code, 827(a)(1)(E). Appellant's attorney shall not disclose the record to appellant or any other person not authorized to inspect the case file under 827, (a)(1) unless, and until such time, as the juvenile court grants appellant's petition for disclosure of juvenile records filed on Jul 18, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Jul 21, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Jun 10, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Minute order dtd Jun 6, 2022, JV-180, JV-183, JV-296-97 and appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Dtd Jul 18, 2022; N.S. (former caregiver)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J286375; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Bernardino County Children and Family Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS VINCENT WALTER